skip to content

Chami, Rose Ali

CPSO#: 94627

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Lebanese University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Pathology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5430 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Lebanon

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:08 May 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 06 Dec 2010 to 18 Feb 2011
PEAP - CF - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 19 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Jun 2012
CF - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 May 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 08 May 2020 Active
             Dr. Rose Ali Chami may practise medicine independently in anatomical pathology.