skip to content

Chambers, Reid William

CPSO#: 95989

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jan 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Medical Arts Clinic
301 - 272 Charlotte St
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone: 705-876-9003
Fax: 705-874-5410 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Reid Chambers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chambers ( CPSO# 95989 )

Business Address:
301 - 272 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone Number: (705) 876-9003


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REID WILLIAM CHAMBERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMBERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2018