skip to content

Chakravarti, Neetu

CPSO#: 92227

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peelmed
475 Charolais Blvd
Brampton ON  L6Y 0M2
Phone: (905) 4543347
Fax: (905) 4543288 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

PeelMed
475 Charlois Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6Y 0M2
Canada
Phone: (905) 454-3347
Fax: (905) 454-3288
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Vista health Clinic
847 Barton street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 3B4
Canada
Phone: (905) 544-5255
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Renew clinic
1015 Cawthra rd
Mississauga ON  L5G4K3
Canada
Phone: 905 2711134
Fax: (905) 271-1130
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Suite 204
8108 Yonge st.
Thornhill ON  L4J1W4
Canada
Phone: 9057099955
Fax: 9057094138
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Neetu Chakravarti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Chakravarti ( CPSO# 92227 )

Business Address:
Renew Medical Clinic
1015 Cawthra Road
Mississauga ON  L5G 4K3
Phone Number: (905) 271-1134

Business Address:
Vista Health Clinic
847 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 3B4
Phone Number: (905) 544-5255


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Wisconsin

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEETU CHAKRAVARTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAKRAVARTI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Oct 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2010

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: May 4, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Update as of January 27, 2017: The member has completed all elements of this SCERP.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)