skip to content

Chakraborty, Krishna

CPSO#: 94618

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Telugu

Education:University of Calcutta, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
KM Medical Centre
Unit 18, 811 Bovaird Drive West
Brampton ON  L6X 0T9
Phone: (905) 455-5252
Fax: (905) 455-2727 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sheridan Doctors Clinic
Suite 6, 373 Steeles Avenue West
Brampton ON  L6Y 0P8
Canada
Phone: 905-452-8881
Fax: 905-452-9997
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Krishna Chakraborty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chakraborty ( CPSO# 94618 )

Business Address:
Suite 6
373 Steels Avenue West
Brampton ON  L6Y 0P8
Phone Number: (905) 452-8881

Business Address:
2262 ManorHill Drive
Mississauga ON  L5M 5B8

Business Address:
Suite 18
811 Bovaird Drive West
Brampton ON  L6X 0T9
Phone Number: (905) 455-5252

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KRISHNA CHAKRABORTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAKRABORTY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2011