skip to content

Chakrabartty, Pradip Kumar

CPSO#: 25515

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calcutta, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996