First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Mar 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2012 |