Chai-adisaksopha, Chatree (CPSO#: 99598)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Chiang Mai University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 07 Nov 2012 to 12 Dec 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 13 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Feb 2015
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018