skip to content

Chai, Hee-Heung

CPSO#: 24403

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Jan 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Seoul National University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Humber River Regional Hospital, 2111 Finch Avenue West, Toronto, ON M3N 1N1
Date Received: 18 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:21 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2015