skip to content

Chahal, Ramandeep Singh

CPSO#: 94070

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Bangalore University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stratford General Hospital
Special Services Unit
90 John Street South
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y8
Phone: (519) 272-8186
Fax: (519) 272-8226 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Listowel Mental Health
Outpatient Services
285 Sarah St. N
Listowel ON  N4W 2Y8
Canada
Phone: (519) 291-1320
Fax: (519) 291-9662
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02

OCCHC, 35 Metcalf Street
Woodstock ON  N4S 3E6
Canada
Phone: (519) 539-1111
Fax: (519) 539-9111
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ramandeep Chahal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chahal ( CPSO# 94070 )

Business Address:
Listowel MH
285 Sarah Street North
Listowel ON  N4W 2Y8
Phone Number: (519) 291-1320

Business Address:
35 Metcalfe Street
Woodstock ON  N4S 3E6
Phone Number: (519) 539-1111

Business Address:
90 John Street South
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y8
Phone Number: (519) 272-8186

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:01 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAMANDEEP SINGH CHAHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAHAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2013