skip to content

Chagla, Zain

CPSO#: 91197

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300-25 Charlton Ave East
Hamilton Ontario
L8N1Y2
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. x33998
Fax: (905) 523-7352 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Zain Chagla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Chagla ( CPSO# 91197 )

Business Address:
310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4

Business Address:
Suite 300
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZAIN CHAGLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAGLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013