Chadha, Yatin (CPSO#: 93809)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yatin Chadha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Chadha ( CPSO# 93809 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YATIN CHADHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHADHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2017