Chadda, Manish (CPSO#: 98618)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Boston University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clear Medical Imaging
1568 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 1K7
Phone: (519) 256-4914
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chadda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 29 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. Chadda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chadda ( CPSO# 98618 )

Business Address:
Clear Medical Imaging
1568 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 1K7
Phone Number: (519) 256-4914

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 03 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANISH CHADDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHADDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2013