skip to content

Watts, Maria del Pilar

CPSO#: 98561

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Oct 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Chacon, Maria del Pilar (used until: 20 Dec 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Autonoma De Bucaramanga, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health Centre
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 200
110 Copper Creak Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Canada
Phone: (647) 696-0945
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: DR. M. Watts MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Watts ( CPSO# 98561 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: 905-966-1171

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:15 Sep 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIA DEL PILAR WATTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATTS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
AVP - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 04 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 05 Jun 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 04 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 05 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 15 Sep 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Sep 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2019