skip to content

Chacko, Saji Abraham

CPSO#: 89816

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 May 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 06 May 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:J. J. M. Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Ajax Medical Clinic
475 Westney Rd N
Ajax ON  L1T 3H4
Phone: (905) 427-7767 Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 May 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Feb 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 28 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 31 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 14 Sep 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 30 Sep 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 30 Sep 2020 Active
 (1 of 2)

As  from  September 30, 2020, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
limitations on certificate  of  registration held by Dr. Saji Abraham Chacko, in
accordance with an undertaking and  consent  given by Dr. Chacko to the College
of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")

of

DR. SAJI ABRAHAM CHACKO
("Dr. Chacko")

to 

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")

A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 

 "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2)	I, Dr. Chacko, certificate of registration number 89816, am a member of the College.  

(3)	I, Dr. Chacko, acknowledge that following an investigation, I underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of my practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about my standard of practice in family medicine.

B.	UNDERTAKING

(4)	I, Dr. Chacko, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5)	Professional Education  

(a)	I, Dr. Chacko, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):

(i)	CMPA's Documentation: Principles of Medical Record keeping e-learning module; 

(ii)	CMPA's workshop: Test Results Follow-up; 

(iii)	University of Ottawa's 69th Annual Refresher Course for Family Physicians; 

(iv)	Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following policies and other self-study:   
         
1.	Medical Records Documentation, College Policy;
2.	Managing Tests, College Policy; and 
3.	Choosing Wisely Canada - Family Medicine. 

(v)	Review and reflection of the following additional resources: 

1.	Diabetes Canada - Monitoring Glycemic Control; 
2.	Unexplained lymphadenopathy: Evaluation and Differential Diagnosis; 
3.	AFP Intimate Partner Violence;
4.	ACOG Prenatal Diagnostic Testing for Genetic Disorders; and
5.	Canadian Paediatric Society's Mental Health: Screening Tools and Rating Scales.

(b)	I, Dr. Chacko, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c)	I, Dr. Chacko, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months, or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, at the first possible opportunity thereafter.

(d)	I, Dr. Chacko, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(e)	I, Dr. Chacko, acknowledge that if any of the programs listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.

(6)	Reassessment of Practice

(a)	I, Dr. Chacko, undertake that, approximately nine (9) months after the completion of the Professional Education set out in section (5) above, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, direct observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.

(b)	I, Dr. Chacko, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 

(c)	I, Dr. Chacko, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 

(7)	Monitoring 

(a)	I, Dr. Chacko, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b)	I, Dr. Chacko, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c)	I, Dr. Chacko, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(d)	I, Dr. Chacko, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "B". 

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(8)	I, Dr. Chacko, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(9)	I, Dr. Chacko, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(10)	I, Dr. Chacko, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(11)	I, Dr. Chacko, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(12)	I, Dr. Chacko, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.

(13)	I, Dr. Chacko, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(14)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Chacko, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Chacko, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Chacko engaged in remediation and underwent a reassessment of his practice following a College investigation. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about his standard of practice in family medicine. As a result: 

Dr. Chacko will engage in professional education, including in diabetic management, management of intimate partner violence, genetic testing in pregnancy, adolescent psychosocial assessment, communication, test results management, and medical record-keeping.  

Dr. Chacko's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately nine months after completion of the professional education. 

(c)	I, Dr. Chacko, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D.	CONSENT

(15)	I, Dr. Chacko, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and to all Assessors:

(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;
(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 
(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(16)	I, Dr. Chacko, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(17)	I, Dr. Chacko, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;
(b)	any information relevant to the Reassessment;
(c)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
(d)	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
 
(2 of 2)                
                  
The  certificate  of  registration held by Dr. Saji Abraham Chacko also carries
the following terms, conditions  and  limitations  imposed  by the Registration
Committee, effective May 6, 2016:

1.    Dr.  Saji Abraham Chacko may practise only in the areas  of  medicine  in
       which Dr. Chacko  is educated and experienced.

 2.    Dr.  Chacko   must   not   issue  new  prescriptions  or  renew  existing
        prescriptions for any of the following substances: 

        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the  Narcotic  Control  Regulations made under
              the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.19);
                  
        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control  Regulations  made
              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.19);
                  
         (iii) Controlled  Drugs  (from  Part  G  of the Food and Drug Regulations
                        under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);
                  
         (iv)  Benzodiazepines   and   Other   Targeted   Substances   (from   the
                        Benzodiazepines  and  Other  Targeted Substances  Regulations  made
                        under the Controlled Drugs and  Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c.19);
                        or
                  
         (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotic Safety and
                Awareness Act, S.O. 2010, c.22) and;
                  
                     as amended from time to time.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 30, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Saji Abraham Chacko to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective September 30, 2020:

Dr. Chacko engaged in remediation and underwent a reassessment of his practice following a College investigation. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about his standard of practice in family medicine. As a result:

Dr. Chacko will engage in professional education, including in diabetic management, management of intimate partner violence, genetic testing in pregnancy, adolescent psychosocial assessment, communication, test results management, and medical record-keeping.

Dr. Chacko’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately nine months after completion of the professional education.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: March 22, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)