skip to content

Chacko, Binita Riya

CPSO#: 97138

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Jan 2020
EXPIRY DATE
31 Dec 2023
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 31 Jan 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Christian Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 89787 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Binita Chacko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chacko ( CPSO# 97138 )
Dr. G. Chiramel ( CPSO# 98630 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Medical Imaging
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-1500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:31 Jan 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 19 Dec 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2020
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2020 Active
             1.    Dr. Binita Riya Chacko may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging, Division of Cardiothoracic Imaging, University of Toronto,
                        in which  Dr.  Chacko  holds an academic appointment at the rank of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  seven years from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or when Dr. Chacko no longer holds the  academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Chacko's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment,  professional  conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an annual report or receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr. Chacko's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on January 31, 2020, and  expires  on December
                  31,  2023.   Upon  renewal  of  Dr. Chacko's academic appointment at  the
                  University of Toronto, the expiry  date  can  be extended, subject to the
                  limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.