Chacko, Anila (CPSO#: 97459)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Apr 2012 to 06 Jun 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015