Chacko, Anil (CPSO#: 99043)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Bangalore University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2012 to 01 Oct 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 02 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Sep 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Aug 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Aug 2014