skip to content

Chackery, Rosemary Crystal

CPSO#: 97699

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Chackery-Palmieri, Rosemary Crystal (used until: 07 Jun 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201 Georgian Drive
Royal Victoria Hospital
Barrie ON  L4M6M2
Phone: 705-728-9090 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Chackery Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 25 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chackery ( CPSO# 97699 )

Business Address:
201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: 7057289090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROSEMARY CRYSTAL CHACKERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHACKERY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017