skip to content

Chabikuli, Sibomana osso

CPSO#: 86024

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Mar 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Lingala, Swahili

Education:Medical University of South Africa(Medun, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
619 Prospect Blvd
Midland ON  L4R 0G3
Phone: 7055277575
Fax: 7055277571 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Chabikuli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chabikuli ( CPSO# 86024 )
Dr. K. Mossanda Chabikuli ( CPSO# 87773 )

Business Address:
Suite 103
240 Old Penetanguishene Road
P O Box 790
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 527-7575

Business Address:
619 Prospect Blvd
Midland ON  L4R 0G3
Phone Number: 7055277575

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SIBOMANA OSSO CHABIKULI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHABIKULI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2007

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 8, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)