skip to content

Cervin, Catherine Ksenie

CPSO#: 30743

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
935 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 2C6
Phone: (705) 662-7284
Fax: (705) 671-3830 Electoral District: 08

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CATHERINE KSENIE CERVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CERVIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 29 Nov 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2011