skip to content

Cernat, Geta

CPSO#: 94474

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vaughan Medical Clinic
Suite 121
9401 Jane Street
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H7
Phone: (905) 303-1080
Fax: (888) 683-7326 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Trench St.
Richmond Hill ON  L4C4Z3
Canada
Phone: 905-883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Geta Cernat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Cernat ( CPSO# 94474 )

Business Address:
3200 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan ON  

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Corporation
Hospitalist Department
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Vaughan Medical Clinic
Suite 121
9401 Jane Street
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H7
Phone Number: (905) 303-1080

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GETA CERNAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CERNAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 19 Oct 2010 to 10 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 11 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 19 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2012