skip to content

Thirlwell, Celeste Jean

CPSO#: 76629

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Apr 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 16 Oct 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Centre for Sleep and
Chronobiology
1054 Wilson Avenue
North York M3K 1G6
Toronto ON  M3K 1G6
Phone: (416) 746-2012
Fax: (416) 746-7016 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

55 Edinbourough St.
Windsor, ON
Windsor ON  N8X 3C3
Canada
Phone: (519) 258-0585
Fax: 519-258-6304
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Sleep Wake Awareness Program (SWAP)
1423 Mosley St., Unit 3
Wasaga Beach ON L9Z 2C3
Wasaga Beach ON  L9Z 2C3
Canada
Phone: 705 352 3900
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Celeste J. Thirlwell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Thirlwell ( CPSO# 76629 )

Business Address:
1054 Wilson Avenue
North York ON  M3K 1G6
Phone Number: (416) 746-3012

Business Address:
100 - 55 Edingborough Street
Windsor ON  N8X 3C3
Phone Number: (519) 258-0585

Business Address:
2352 Yonge Street
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M4P 2E6
Phone Number: (416) 840-5991

Business Address:
301 - 295 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1S2
Phone Number: (416) 603-9531

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:05 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Oct 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Feb 2012
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2013
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 16 Oct 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 01 Nov 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 05 Nov 2021
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 05 Nov 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 05 Nov 2021 Active
 (1 of 2)

As from 11:59 p.m., November 5, 2021, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Celeste Jean Thirlwell :

Practice Restriction 
(1)	Dr. Thirlwell shall not provide medical exemptions in relation to vaccines for COVID-19;
(2)	Dr. Thirlwell shall not provide medical exemptions in relation to mask requirements for COVID-19; 
(3)	Dr. Thirlwell shall not provide medical exemptions in relation to testing for COVID-19.
Posting a Sign and Translations 
(4)	Dr. Thirlwell shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, at all times whether or not she is physically present at the Practice Location, in the form set out at Schedule "A." If providing care in a virtual setting, Dr. Thirlwell shall display the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. If the patient encounter is by telephone, Dr. Thirlwell shall read the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter.  For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: "Dr. Thirlwell must not provide medical exemptions in relation to COVID-19 vaccines, mask requirements or testing. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".

(5)	Dr. Thirlwell shall post a certified translation(s) in any language(s) in which she provides services, of the sign described in (4) above, in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of her Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form attached hereto as Schedule "A". 
(6)	Dr. Thirlwell shall provide the certified translation(s) described in (5) above to the College within 30 days of the date of this Order;
(7)	The College may accept an alternative arrangement with respect to signage in a hospital setting, in its sole discretion.
Notification of Practice Locations
(8)	Dr. Thirlwell shall inform the College of each and every location at which she practices including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s), office(s) and virtual care setting(s) in any jurisdiction (collectively the "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of this Order.  Going forward, she shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at or accepting patients from that location.
Monitoring
(9)	Dr. Thirlwell shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, provide to the College her irrevocable consent in the form attached at Schedule "B" for the College to make appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan ("OHIP"), to monitor her compliance with the terms of this Order.
(10)	Dr. Thirlwell shall maintain a log of all professional encounters with patients, including both in-person encounters and encounters in a virtual setting, in the form attached at Schedule "C" ("Patient Log"). Dr. Thirlwell shall include in the Patient Log the name of each patient with whom she has a professional encounter and the date of the encounter; the patient's date of birth; the reason for the visit; and the type of visit (i.e., telemedicine or in-person).
(11)	Dr. Thirlwell shall provide a copy of the Patient Log to the College every two (2) weeks, or at any other time as requested by the College. 
(12)	Dr. Thirlwell shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of her Practice Locations and to inspections of patient charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor Dr. Thirlwell's compliance with the terms of this Order.
(13)	Dr. Thirlwell shall consent to the College providing the Order to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location where she practices or has privileges ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to this Order and/or any information arising from the monitoring of her compliance with this Order.

(2 of 2)
As from October 16, 2019, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Celeste Jean Thirlwell,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Thirlwell has given to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                      DR. CELESTE JEAN THIRLWELL
                                           ("Dr. Thirlwell")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System
                   implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Thirlwell, certificate of registration number 76629, am a member
                  of the College. 

            (3)   I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that the College conducted investigations
                  bearing File
                  Numbers 7215886 and 1102304 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my sleep medicine
                  practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that I am entering into two Undertakings on
                  this date and that, if both Undertakings as signed by me are accepted by
                  the ICR Committee, the College will also deliver a caution in person. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Thirlwell, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the
                  ICR Committee ("Effective Date").

            (6)   Resignation of Prescribing Privileges - Narcotics and Narcotic
            Preparations   
                  
                  (a)   I, Dr. Thirlwell, undertake that I will not issue new prescriptions
                        or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the
                        following substances:
                  
                              (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                                    made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act,
                                    S.C., 1996, c. 19); and
                  
                              (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control
                                    Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
                                    Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
                  
                              (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                              Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached
                              hereto as Appendix "A"; and links to the current regulatory
                              lists are attached hereto as Appendix "B") 
                  
                              and as amended from time to time. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Thirlwell, undertake that I will return any supplies of the
                        substances referred to in section (a) above that are presently in
                        my possession, in any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and secure
                        manner, as stipulated in the College's Policy Number 8-12,
                        "Prescribing Drugs."
                  
            (7)   Change of Scope 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Thirlwell, undertake that, in the event that I intend to
                        resume prescribing Narcotic Drugs or Narcotic Preparations in the
                        future, I will notify the College and comply with the process set
                        out in the College's Policy on Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope
                        of Practice and/or Re-Entering Practice.
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Thirlwell, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Thirlwell, undertake that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Thirlwell, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Thirlwell, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr.
                              Thirlwell engaged in professional misconduct and/or is
                              incompetent in her sleep medicine practice. As a result of
                              the investigation:
                  
                              Dr. Thirwell must not issue new prescriptions or renew
                              existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following
                              substances:
                  
                              (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                                    made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act,
                                    S.C., 1996, c. 19); and
                  
                              (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control
                                    Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
                                    Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19).
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Thirlwell, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.





Concerns

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: July 13, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Member
Active Date: October 16, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Celeste Jean Thirlwell to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 16, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Thirlwell engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in her sleep medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Thirwell must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances:

Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); and

Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19).

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: October 16, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: October 16, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)