skip to content

Cavalcante Lima Filho, Jose Hermenio

CPSO#: 92635

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Mar 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 23 Mar 2020
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:Universidade Federal Do Ceara, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Michael DeGroote School of Medicine
Department of Medicine HSC 3W10
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4L8
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Medicine
Division of Dermatology
1200 Main St. West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76084
Fax: (905) 521-5051
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hermenio Lima Filho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cavalcante Lima Filho ( CPSO# 92635 )

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Department of Medicine
Division of Dermatology
Hamilton ON  L8S 4J9
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective:25 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective:25 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Apr 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Mar 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Mar 2020 Active
             Dr. Jose Hermenio Cavalcante Lima Filho may practise medicine independently in
            dermatology and clinical immunology and allergy.