skip to content

Caulley, Lisa Maatekor

CPSO#: 98138

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
S-Room M2566 Box 216
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 6137985555 Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Northwest Territories
Nunavut
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LISA MAATEKOR CAULLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAULLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2017