skip to content

Cauchi, Mario Mark

CPSO#: 22743

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Aug 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Apr 2003

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mario Cauchi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 1 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2003
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 06 Aug 2003
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 15 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 04 Jun 2019
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Aug 2020

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Jan 2003
Summary:

 On January 20, 2003, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Cauchi committed professional 
 misconduct in that he falsified a record relating to his practice and committed an act of 
 professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional.  The Committee reserved its decision on penalty.

On April 16, 
 2003, the Discipline Committee ordered and direct that:

1.	 Dr. Cauchi attend before the panel to 
 be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.

2.	The Registrar 
 suspend Dr. Cauchi(s certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months, commencing on 
 May 1, 2003.  Two (2) months of the suspension will be suspended on the condition that Dr. Cauchi 
 successfully complete a course in ethics acceptable to the Registrar, the course to be completed 
 by May 1, 2004.

3.	The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. 
 Cauchi(s certificate of registration for a period of three (3) years; Dr. Cauchi is not to 
 practice as a sole practitioner in an independent practice and is to practice only in a setting 
 acceptable to the Registrar with a partner or partners, supervisor or employer.

4.	Dr. Cauchi pay 
 a portion of the College(s costs, fixed in the amount of $2,500 by April 1, 2004.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 20, 2003

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Oct 1999
Summary:

 On October 8, 1999, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Cauchi(s plea of guilty and found him 
 guilty of professional misconduct.  The Committee ordered the following penalty:

1.	Dr. Cauchi is 
 to be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.
2.	Dr. Cauchi is to 
 pay $5,000.00 fine to the Minister of Finance.
3.	Dr. Cauchi is to pay $3,000.00 in costs to the 
 College.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 08, 1999

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 24, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Cauchi to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 24, 2020:

A College investigation into Dr. Cauchi’s practice was commenced. In the face of this investigation, Dr. Cauchi resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)