skip to content

Catching, John David

CPSO#: 22816

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jun 1970
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 06 Mar 2014
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Wisconsin, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Almonte General Hospital
75 Spring St. ALMONTE, ON
K0A 1A0
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone: 613 256-2500 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 21 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 06 Mar 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 06 Mar 2014 Active
             As from March 6, 2014, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. John David Catching,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Catching to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Catching's practice is restricted to non-acute office cardiology and
                  to non-cardiology practice outside of a hospital and/or clinical setting.