Catana, Dragos (CPSO#: 98763)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Montreal, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Neurosurgery
McMaster University, HSC 3Z5
1200 Main St W, Hamilton, ON
L8N 3Z5
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46626
Fax: 905 577-1458
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DRAGOS CATANA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CATANA is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. CATANA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CATANA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CATANA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CATANA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CATANA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 12 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 13 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019