skip to content

Castro, Denise de Andrade

CPSO#: 90170

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Oct 2019
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 25 Oct 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Severino Sombra, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  L7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2301 Electoral District: 06

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Brazil

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:25 Oct 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 06 Mar 2009
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Radiology

University Of Toronto, 07 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Paediatric Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Paediatric Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2019
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 25 Oct 2019 Active
             1.    Dr. Denise de Andrade Castro may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Diagnostic Radiology, Queen's University, in which Dr. Castro holds
                        an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or  when  Dr.  Castro  no  longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Castro's clinical
                        performance,  knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does  not  receive  an  annual  report  or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Castro's  certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on October 25, 2019, and expires on  June  30,
                  2022.   Upon  renewal  of  Dr.  Castro's  academic appointment at Queen's
                  University, the expiry date can be extended,  subject  to the limitations
                  in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.