skip to content

Casson, Richard Ian

CPSO#: 29356

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jul 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
312 Old Airport Rd
Yellowknife NT  X1A 3T3
Phone: 8677679125

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wilson and Casson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Casson ( CPSO# 29356 )
Dr. C. Wilson ( CPSO# 29877 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Family Medicine Centre
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone Number: (613) 533-9303


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Northwest Territories

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:01 Nov 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICHARD IAN CASSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1977