skip to content

Cassol, Clarissa Araujo

CPSO#: 95232

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Sep 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Araujo Cassol, Clarissa (used until: 05 Sep 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Federal Univ of Santa Catarina, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Toronto General Hospital Department of Pathology 200 Elizabeth Street Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Date Received: 10 May 2017


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 28 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 2017