skip to content

Cassim, Essop Moosajee

CPSO#: 22410

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Oct 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English, Gujarati

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: E.M. Cassim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent S, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1 Fax: 416-398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 26 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 2014