skip to content

Cassie, Scott Gordon

CPSO#: 96819

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
#105 984 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone: 807-346-1440
Fax: 807-346-1445 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Scott Cassie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cassie ( CPSO# 96819 )

Business Address:
200 - 1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7A5
Phone Number: (807) 345-5055

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SCOTT GORDON CASSIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASSIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 19 Sep 2011 to 02 Oct 2011
EL - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 03 Oct 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
EL - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012