skip to content

Cassidy, Walter Joseph

CPSO#: 21286

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Apr 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Apr 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Solutions Inc. 28 Eugene St Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 www.docudavit.com Tel: 416-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083
Instructions: Patients should contact Docudavit Solutions Inc. to request a copy of their medical record.
Date Received: 29 Mar 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:18 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Apr 2018