skip to content

Cassagneau, Romain Jean Guy

CPSO#: 99794

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Bordeaux, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jan 2013 to 11 Mar 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Mar 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jan 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2014