skip to content

Casey, Deborah Ksan

CPSO#: 94274

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
General Respirology Clinic
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
A-Wing, 4th Floor, Room 459
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-5953
Fax: 416-480-5153 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Sleep and Pulmonary Centre
Suite 1011, 123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: 416-813-2277
Fax: 416-260-3203
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

General Respirology Clinic
West Park Healthcare Centre
82 Buttonwood Road
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5
Canada
Phone: 416-243-3631
Fax: 416-243-3696
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:03 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DEBORAH KSAN CASEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012