skip to content

Cases, Margaret Robin Billano

CPSO#: 91408

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Dec 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M.R.B. Cases Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cases ( CPSO# 91408 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Kingston Heart Clinic
460 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1C2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3242


Corporation Name: Cases Zhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cases ( CPSO# 91408 )
Dr. T. Zhu ( CPSO# 98584 )

Business Address:
460 Princess St
Kingston Heart Clinic
Kingston ON  K7L 1C2
Phone Number: 6135443242

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:29 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARGARET ROBIN BILLANO CASES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2014