skip to content

Caryl, William Goldstein

CPSO#: 95770

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Goldstein, William Caryl (used until: 17 Oct 2011 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M3M0B2
Phone: 416 242 1000 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Salz and Caryl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Caryl ( CPSO# 95770 )
Dr. L. Salz ( CPSO# 100175)

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Elignton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut
Turks and Caicos Islands

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:06 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WILLIAM GOLDSTEIN CARYL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARYL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 17 Oct 2011
AVP - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 06 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2015