skip to content

Carvalho, Elda Eveline

CPSO#: 85463

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: De Carvalho, Elda Eveline Baptistelli Pereira (used until: 13 Sep 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:U ESTADUAL PAULISTA-BOTUCATU SAO PAOLO, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
221 Brant Ave
Phone: 519- 750-7333

Additional Practice Location(s)

1-353 St Paul Ave
Brantford ON  N3R 4N3
Canada
Phone: 519-759-6089
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5
Canada
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

270 King George Rd
Brantford ON  N3R 5L5
Canada
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

60 Hatt St
Dundas ON  L9H 7T6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: E E Carvalho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Carvalho ( CPSO# 85463 )

Business Address:
Suite 15B
1815 Ironstone Major
Pickering ON  L1W 3W9
Phone Number: (905) 831-1800

Business Address:
298 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2N 3B1
Phone Number: (416) 223-6500

Business Address:
206 - 18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone Number: (905) 793-5858

Business Address:
B4 - 1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 845-0014

Business Address:
309 - 1371 Nelison Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (416) 287-1818

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELDA EVELINE CARVALHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARVALHO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2019