skip to content

Carter, Paul Stephen

CPSO#: 91624

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Oxford University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
#2, 482 Burlington Avenue
Burlington, Ontario
Burlington ON  L7S 1R5
Phone: 289-427-5962
Fax: 289-427-5972 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Cory S. Goldberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Goldberg ( CPSO# 73687 )
Dr. P. Carter ( CPSO# 91624 )

Business Address:
Queensway Professional Centre
Suite 401
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (416) 907-5810

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAUL STEPHEN CARTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PEAP - CF - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2016