skip to content

Carter, Monica Gayle

CPSO#: 90771

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 190
Hornepayne Community Hospital
Hornepayne ON  P0M 1Z0
Phone: 807-868-2442 Electoral District: 08

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Georgia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hornepayne Community Hospital Hornepayne

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Sep 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MONICA GAYLE CARTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2011