skip to content

Carter, Jonathan Mathew

CPSO#: 95304

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland Faculty of Medi, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
First Avenue Family Medical Centre
6 First Avenue
St Thomas ON  N5R 4M2
Phone: (519) 633-6050
Fax: (519) 633-6053 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Elmwood Place
46 Elmwood Pl
London ON  N6J 1J2
Canada
Phone: 519-433-7259
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Dearness Home
710 Southdale Road
London ON  N6C4R2
Canada
Phone: 519-661-0400
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jonathan Carter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Carter ( CPSO# 95304 )

Business Address:
First Avenue Family Medical Centre
6 First Avenue
St Thomas ON  N5R 4M2
Phone Number: (519) 633-6050

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JONATHAN MATHEW CARTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2013