skip to content

Carter, Jane Yolande

CPSO#: 33306

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1991
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:10 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1991