skip to content

Carter, Christopher James

CPSO#: 31247

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 1985
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Sep 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 1985