skip to content

Cartagena, Ana Milagro

CPSO#: 88477

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Feb 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 302
564 Belmont Ave West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: 519-742-0495
Fax: 519-571-7555 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital
Freeport Campus
3570 King St E
Kitchener ON  N2A2W1
Canada
Phone: 519-749-4300
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A.M. Cartagena Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cartagena ( CPSO# 88477 )
Dr. U. Jolly ( CPSO# 88481 )

Business Address:
Neurocardiac Associates
302 - 564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 742-0495

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANA MILAGRO CARTAGENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARTAGENA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2014