skip to content

Carswell, David James

CPSO#: 24958

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Feb 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Feb 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Nov 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1981
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2013
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Feb 2016