skip to content

Carstensen, Heinrich Michael

CPSO#: 88966

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Collingwood General
& Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone: (705) 445-2550 Ext. 8678 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: H. M. Carstensen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Carstensen ( CPSO# 88966 )

Business Address:
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HEINRICH MICHAEL CARSTENSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARSTENSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013