skip to content

Carruthers, Danny Evan

CPSO#: 26040

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Aug 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D. E. Carruthers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 2 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, Ontario M6B 3Z4 Tel: (416) 781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 28 Mar 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018