skip to content

Carroll, David Michael

CPSO#: 91178

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
Royal Victoria
Regional Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Barrie Endoscopy
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Lowel Level Suite #1
Barrie ON  L4M7G1
Canada
Phone: (705) 797-1112
Fax: (705) 797-1113
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Royal Centre of Plastic Surgery
22 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Canada
Phone: (705) 302-3437
Fax: (705) 726-2851
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David Carroll Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Carroll ( CPSO# 91178 )
Dr. M. Tassone ( CPSO# 103298)

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Department of Anesthesia
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
LL1 - 5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 797-1112

Business Address:
22 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 302-3437

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID MICHAEL CARROLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARROLL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2014