skip to content

Carroll, Bryan William

CPSO#: 26397

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 May 1990

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:10 Mar 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 May 1990
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 02 May 1990
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2008
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 08 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 12 Apr 2012
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Oct 2012
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 15 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 22 Jan 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2014

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Oct 2012
Summary:

On October 15, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Bryan William Carroll committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration, and in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Carroll admitted the allegations.

In 2008, Dr. Carroll was the subject of a discipline proceeding, in which the Discipline Committee ordered, among other things, that he undergo a Comprehensive Practice Assessment (CPA) and that he abide by any and all recommendations made. The CPA assessor recommended that Dr. Carroll comply with the currently accepted guidelines with respect to ordering colposcopy and uroflow studies. On January 8, 2010, Dr. Carroll entered into an undertaking to abide by the currently accepted consensus threshold for ordering colposcopy and uroflow studies.

In 2010, Dr. Carroll's supervisor reported that Dr. Carroll continued to perform colposcopy without indication. An investigation, including a review by an independent assessor, found that Dr. Carroll had performed repeated colposcopy and/or uroflow studies where they were not indicated or were unnecessary in relation to 7 of 15 patient charts reviewed.

In three occasions in 2011, Dr. Carroll's supervisor provided positive reports indicating that in the charts he reviewed, Dr. Carroll performed few colposcopies, all of which were indicated, and that he saw no evidence of patient care or prescribing that did not meet the appropriate standard of care for an obstetrician/gynaecologist practising in Ontario. Prior to the referral of this matter to the Discipline Committee, on April 12, 2012, Dr. Carroll entered into an undertaking agreeing that, effective immediately, he will cease to engage in colposcopy and uroflow studies altogether.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
the Registrar suspend Dr. Carroll's certificate of registration for a period of two (2) months, to commence October 15th, 2012.
Dr. Carroll appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
Dr. Carroll pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): October 15, 2012

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Dec 2008
Summary:

On December 12, 2008, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Bryan William Carroll to have committed an act of professional misconduct that Dr. Carroll has committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
The Committee ordered and directed the following:

1. the Registrar to suspend Dr. Carroll s certificate of registration for a period of two months, to commence on January 1, 2009.

2. the Registrar to impose immediately the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Carroll s Certificate of Registration:

(a) Dr. Carroll shall not prescribe narcotics or controlled drugs and substances as defined in Schedules I to IV of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, including but not limited to all narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances;

(b) At his own expense, Dr. Carroll shall undergo a comprehensive practice assessment, to be completed no later than within four months of his return to practice on March 1, 2009, by an assessor approved by the College (the CPA ) and shall abide by any and all recommendations made as result of the CPA;

(c) Dr. Carroll shall practice only under the supervision of a practice monitor approved by the College who has signed an undertaking and who has reviewed the College s expert report dated September 18, 2007 and who will be provided with a copy of the CPA report. This practice monitor will be at Dr. Carroll s expense and will report regularly to the College or immediately if the practice monitor has concerns regarding patient safety or regarding Dr. Carroll s compliance with the terms of this order;

(d) If there are no recommendations for remediation arising from the CPA, Dr. Carroll s supervision as referred to in subparagraph 3(c) above will terminate following his completion of the CPA. If there are any recommendations for remediation arising from the CPA, Dr. Carroll's supervision shall remain in place until the assessor confirms to the College that the remediation has been successfully completed;

(e) At his own expense, Dr. Carroll shall undergo a re-assessment of his practice, the results of which are to be provided to the College, to be conducted approximately nine months after his completion of the CPA, if no remediation is required as a result of the CPA, or nine months after the assessor confirms to the College that the remediation has been successfully completed, if there is a recommendation for remediation following the CPA; and

(f) Dr. Carroll shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of his practice(s) and patient charts by College representatives for the purposes of assessing his compliance with these terms, conditions and limitations on his certificate of registration.

3. that Dr. Carroll to pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650.00, within 30 days of the date of this Order.

4. that the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): December 12, 2008

Concerns

Source: Fitness to Practice Committee
Active Date: December 31, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Carroll has resigned from the College and has agreed not to apply or reapply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.