skip to content

Carriere, Mathieu Jean

CPSO#: 89329

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 695-9933
Fax: (613) 695-8882 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Carriere Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Duigenan ( CPSO# 89947 )
Dr. M. Carriere ( CPSO# 89329 )

Business Address:
204 - 595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone Number: (613) 695-9933

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
1111 Ghislain Street
Prescott ON  K6A 3E5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATHIEU JEAN CARRIERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARRIERE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013